Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón María Adurriaga Uribe

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1755Born
25 Apr 182468.4SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
24 May 182468.5ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
17 Oct 182468.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
2 Feb 184185.2DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón María Adurriaga Uribe
Bishop Ramón María Adurriaga Uribe (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOñate

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 141, Number 762
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast