Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ibrahim Addai-Scher

Deceased

Bishop of Seert (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1867BornShaqlawa
15 Aug 188922.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 190235.5AppointedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
30 Nov 190235.7Ordained BishopBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
21 Jun 191548.3DiedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Ibrahim Addai-Scher:
Bishop Ibrahim Addai-Scher (born , died ) Bishop of Seert

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,357
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 515
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013