Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church

Pontificia Commissio de Bonis Culturalibus Ecclesiae

United

To: Pontifical Council for Culture



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for Preserving the Church’s Patrimoney of Art and History
28 June 1988ErectedPontifical Commission for Preserving the Church’s Patrimoney of Art and History (erected)
Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
25 March 1993Name ChangedPontifical Commission for Preserving the Church’s Patrimoney of Art and History Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
30 July 2012UnitedPontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church Pontifical Council for Culture

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.6, 16 Apr 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast