Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Palembang

Archidioecesis Palembangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Yohanes Harun Yuwono, Archbishop
  • Aloysius Sudarso, S.C.I., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 July 2003
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 188,570 (72,835 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://keuskupan-palembang.or.id/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. Tasik 18, Palembang 30135, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0711)350.417
  • Fax: 314.776

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Benkoelen
27 December 1923ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Sumatra Prefecture Apostolic of Benkoelen (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Palembang
13 June 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Benkoelen Vicariate Apostolic of Palembang
19 June 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Palembang Prefecture Apostolic of Padang (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Tandjung-Karang (erected)
Diocese of Palembang
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Palembang Diocese of Palembang
Archdiocese of Palembang
1 July 2003ElevatedDiocese of Palembang Archdiocese of Palembang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Palembang
19505,4102,500,000.2%191928436768ap1951
Diocese of Palembang
197024,9994,500,000.6%323278147121ap1971
198037,0455,620,000.7%131321,15751116ap1981
199059,6707,406,000.8%436401,4916419224ap1991
199972,96810,500,000.7%1646621,1766522126ap2000
200074,23310,750,000.7%1940591,2586022726ap2001
200176,48011,852,600.6%2244661,1586322226ap2002
200277,29811,622,559.7%2245671,1537322726ap2003
Archdiocese of Palembang
200376,20110,828,441.7%2247691,1046523626ap2004
201373,26512,588,884.6%3153848726933326ap2014
201676,50912,993,702.6%3355888697532726ap2017
201980,07014,217,147.6%4152938607836829ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast