Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bikoro

Dioecesis Bikoroensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bikoro
3 January 1931ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville
Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bikoro (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Bikoro
25 June 1940ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Bikoro Prefecture Apostolic of Bikoro
Vicariate Apostolic of Bikoro
28 June 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bikoro Vicariate Apostolic of Bikoro
Diocese of Bikoro
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bikoro Diocese of Bikoro
12 April 1975UnitedDiocese of Bikoro
Archdiocese of Mbandaka
Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Bikoro
195013,34482,19816.2%141495320167ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Bikoro
Diocese of Bikoro
195921,371106,74520.0%232392936248ap1960
196926,450116,25022.8%12627979312911ap1971

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast