Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Armidale

Dioecesis Armidalensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 November 1862
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Sydney
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 91,500 (35,341 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 93, Armidale, N.S.W. 2350, Australia
  • Telephone: (02) 6772-4971
  • Fax: 5701-5140

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 November 1862ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Armidale (erected)
5 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Armidale Diocese of Grafton (erected)
10 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Armidale
Diocese of Bathurst
Diocese of Goulburn
Diocese of Wilcannia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
194925,000133,00018.8%362386571723825ap1951
195928,894140,88120.5%456515663620725ap1960
196630,592148,10020.7%564605093020656ap1967
197037,500150,80024.9%516576573021429ap1971
198042,016183,00023.0%444488751714625ap1981
199035,455158,69922.3%38240886148326ap1991
199940,244163,94324.5%273301,34185827ap2000
200040,110162,81024.6%254291,38384927ap2001
200142,280161,73426.1%236291,457106027ap2002
200241,437158,68526.1%305351,183115427ap2003
200339,233159,94324.5%306361,089115525ap2004
200447,343161,08329.4%286341,392105325ap2005
200643,223275321,350104325ap2007*
201242,893182,00023.6%285331,299172825ap2013
201545,295176,54325.7%273301,509251825ap2016
201841,004170,01724.1%325371,108251825ap2019

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast