Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bohuslas von Zwole

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1454AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
12 Jan 1455Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
31 Jul 1457DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Bohuslas von Zwole
Bishop Bohuslas von Zwole (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
Death PlaceWien

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 206
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,601
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1455, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast