Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Leopoldo Zelli Jacobuzi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1818Born
28 Mar 183718.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jun 184122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Aug 186748.9AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
22 Sep 186748.9InstalledAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
11 Nov 189577.1DiedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Zelli Jacobuzi
Abbot Leopoldo Zelli Jacobuzi O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Death PlaceSan Callisto
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo, Cemetery

  • a priest for 54.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast