Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Norbert of Xanten

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1080¹Born
1120²40.0AppointedAbbot General of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
18 Jul 112646.5AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
25 Jul 112646.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
1128²48.0CeasedAbbot General of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
6 Jun 113454.4DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
1215²Beatified
28 Jul 1582Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Norbert of Xanten (VIAF: 75264960)
Archbishop St. Norbert of Xanten (born 1080, died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXanten

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast