Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edmond Édouard Wolff, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1899Born
6 Jul 192627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
7 Jan 193939.6AppointedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
4 Aug 193940.1DiedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Edmond Édouard Wolff
Father Edmond Édouard Wolff S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Korhogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaguenau, France

  • a priest for 13.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast