Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Heinrich (Philipp Ernst) von Warnsdorf, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1745Born
176216.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 176823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Oct 181469.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fulda, Germany
17 Feb 181771.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich (Philipp Ernst) von Warnsdorf
Father Heinrich (Philipp Ernst) von Warnsdorf O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWürzburg

  • a priest for 48.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast