Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Vittrici

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Sep 1632AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
24 Oct 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
20 Oct 1646AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Dec 1647ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1648¹ResignedBishop of Alatri, Italy
5 Oct 1650DiedBishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Vittrici (VIAF: 680145857092222922116)
Bishop Alessandro Vittrici (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 21
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast