Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Villiers, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1372AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
12 Sep 1375AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
11 Jun 1377DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Villiers
Bishop Pierre de Villiers O.P. (died ) Bishop of Troyes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494, and Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast