Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geoffroy de Veyrols

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1342AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
19 Feb 1347AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
18 Jan 1357AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
10 Mar 1361AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
10 Mar 1376DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy de Veyrols
Archbishop Geoffroy de Veyrols (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 168, and Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast