Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Vallau, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1379AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
2 Dec 1388AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
23 Apr 1400DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Vallau
Bishop Guillaume de Vallau O.P. (died ) Bishop of Evreux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 235, and Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast