Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Ezequiel Vacas Galindo, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1865Born
31 Oct 188015.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Dec 188116.7First VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Oct 188722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1898²32.7AppointedPrefect of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador
1909²43.7ResignedPrefect of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador
11 Jun 193873.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Ezequiel Vacas Galindo (VIAF: 17288150)
Bishop Enrique Ezequiel Vacas Galindo O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Canelos e Macas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotacachi
Ordained PriestCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito
Death PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 50.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast