Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Udalrich (Ulrich)

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1092AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
16 May 1092Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
7 Aug 1121DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Udalrich (Ulrich)
Bishop Udalrich (Ulrich) (died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast