Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Tylicki

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹Born
17 Jul 159552.5AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
Oct 1595³52.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 Oct 160057.7AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
14 Jun 160461.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
1 Jan 160764.0AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
13 Jul 161673.5DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Tylicki (VIAF: 161935194)
Bishop Piotr Tylicki (born 1543, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKowalu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast