Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Tris Lacal, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1623Born
2 Jul 163915.9ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
18 Dec 167350.3AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
22 Apr 167450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
3 Jul 168258.9DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Tris Lacal
Bishop Pedro Tris Lacal O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalatayud
Ordained BishopValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 211, Number 1,316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,657
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,903
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast