Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Trie

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Apr 1312AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
28 Mar 1324AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
26 Sep 1334DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Trie
Archbishop Guillaume de Trie (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 419, and Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast