Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theulf

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Dec 1113AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 1115Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
20 Oct 1123DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Theulf
Bishop Theulf (died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWestminster

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 42
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast