Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Thésait

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1360AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
14 Apr 1374AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
12 Oct 1375DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Thésait
Archbishop Louis Thésait (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 419, and Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast