Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola de Teramo

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1345AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
4 Sep 1349AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
21 Oct 1349AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1363¹DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola de Teramo
Archbishop Nicola de Teramo (died 1363) Archbishop of Oristano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 462, and Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Aug 2021

Quantcast