Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teobaldo , O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1298SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
18 Oct 1298ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
18 Nov 1331DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teobaldo
Bishop Teobaldo O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Verona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 522, and Page 523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast