Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Tcheng Ngnou-tang (Cheng Yutang)

Deceased

Prefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1878Born
18 Jun 190325.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 193254.3AppointedPrefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China
10 Mar 194264.1DiedPrefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Tcheng Ngnou-tang (Cheng Yutang)
Father Peter Tcheng Ngnou-tang (Cheng Yutang) (born , died ) Prefect of Hungtung [Hongdong]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaki
Death PlacePrison, Lin-feng

  • a priest for 38.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast