Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Tarnawski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1667¹Born
1711¹44.0AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland
10 Sep 171144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland
18 Feb 171851.1DiedBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michal Tarnawski
Bishop Michal Tarnawski O.S.B.M. (born 1667, died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
Ordained BishopTransfiguration, Church, Spas
Death PlaceTurzec, Archdiocese of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 290
  • ob/c2/b: JI, 1 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2/b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast