Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Széchényi

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jul 1342AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
28 Nov 1362AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
5 Jul 1377DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Mihály Széchényi
Bishop Mihály Széchényi (died ) Bishop of Eger

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 78, and Page 512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast