Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Subiani, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Smirne, Turkey


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1644AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Smirne, Turkey
14 Nov 1644AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
29 Sep 1645Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
13 Jul 1648SucceededArchbishop of Smirne, Turkey
15 Oct 1656DiedArchbishop of Smirne, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Subiani
Archbishop Giacinto Subiani O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Smirne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 162, and Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 319
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1645, Number 40
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast