Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel a San Serio, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1539AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
3 Jun 1541AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
5 May 1542DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Gabriel a San Serio
Bishop Gabriel a San Serio O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Ferns

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 191, and Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,539, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast