Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Giovanni Spínola, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1620AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
28 Oct 1620Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
6 Mar 1623AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
1639²DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Giovanni Spínola
Bishop Vincenzo Giovanni Spínola O.S.A. (died 1639) Bishop of Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSant’Agostino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122, and Page 326
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 25
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,978
  • c34: CB, 30 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,058

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast