Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Marino Sormani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1632Born
11 Oct 168855.9AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
17 Oct 168855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
12 Aug 170269.8DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Marino Sormani
Bishop Pier Marino Sormani O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiguardo
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,872
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 30
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,768
  • ~c2: AT, 17 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast