Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas da Santo Magno

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1341Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
11 Jun 1341ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
12 Jul 1382DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Thomas da Santo Magno
Bishop Thomas da Santo Magno (died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 165
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast