Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mark Skerret

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698²Born
20 Nov 174850.8SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
23 Jan 174951.0ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
23 Jan 174951.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
21 Apr 174951.3SelectedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
5 May 174951.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
19 Aug 178587.6DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Mark Skerret
Archbishop Mark Skerret (born 1698, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinduff
Death PlaceAnnaghdown Co. Galway

  • a bishop for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77, and Page 420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 37
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 118, and Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast