Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessio di Siregno, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Sep 1405AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
20 Aug 1409AppointedBishop of Gap, France
27 Aug 1411AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1 Jan 1447DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessio di Siregno
Bishop Alessio di Siregno O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Piacenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 401, and Page 514
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Jun 2021

Quantcast