Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakob von Sierck

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany

Apostolic Administrator of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1398Born
19 May 143940.7AppointedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
30 Aug 143941.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
2 Sep 145557.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Metz, France
28 May 145657.8DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob von Sierck
Archbishop Jakob von Sierck (born Aug 1398, died ) Archbishop of Trier

  • a bishop for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 255
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast