Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick O’Shea (Shee)

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660²Born
8 Jun 168828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
19 Jul 173171.5SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
28 Jul 173171.5ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
3 Jul 173676.5DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick O’Shea (Shee)
Bishop Patrick O’Shea (Shee) (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 48.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 39
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast