Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Santo Galdino, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1769Born
4 Aug 179324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
23 Dec 180132.6SelectedBishop of Macau, China
20 Dec 180233.6ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
27 Mar 180333.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
20 Aug 180435.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Goa, India
10 Feb 181242.8SucceededArchbishop of Goa, India
15 Jul 183162.2DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Manuel Santo Galdino
Archbishop Manuel Santo Galdino O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 9
  • d: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 205, and Page 248
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast