Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Sferrato, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1351¹AppointedBishop of Civita (Tempio), Italy
10 Jun 1351Ordained BishopBishop of Civita (Tempio), Italy
6 Nov 1353AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
29 Jan 1378AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1384¹RemovedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Sferrato
Bishop Tommaso Sferrato O.F.M. , Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 328, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast