Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude de Seyssel

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1458Born
3 Dec 151153.9AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
11 May 151759.3AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
1 Jun 152062.4DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claude de Seyssel
Archbishop Claude de Seyssel (born 1458, died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-les-Bains

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309, and Page 237
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast