Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father St. Francesco Serrano Frías, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1695Born
1713¹17.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Sep 174549.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
22 Sep 174549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
26 May 174751.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
28 Oct 174852.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
14 May 1893Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Francesco Serrano Frías
Father St. Francesco Serrano Frías O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuéneja, Archdiocese of Granada, Spain
Death PlaceFoochow

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast