Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Segrave

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1313SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
25 Nov 1313Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 1316DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Segrave
Bishop Gilbert Segrave (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 289
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast