Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Honorius IV

Giacomo Savelli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹Born
17 Dec 126151.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
17 Dec 126151.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 128575.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 May 128575.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 128575.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Apr 128777.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Savelli
Pope Giacomo Savelli (born 1210, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 1.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1261
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast