Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Sánchez de Somoza Quiroga

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²Born
21 Jun 163863.4AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
23 Jan 163964.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
14 Aug 164469.6DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Sánchez de Somoza Quiroga
Bishop Gonzalo Sánchez de Somoza Quiroga (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María de Ferreira
Ordained BishopBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,411
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 165, Number 1,039
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast