Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Martínez Zarzosa

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1583Born
26 Jan 164359.4SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
13 Jul 164359.9ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
15 May 164460.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
1 Mar 164965.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
31 Jan 165672.4AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
24 Jun 165874.8DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Martínez Zarzosa
Bishop Diego Martínez Zarzosa (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalahorra, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopCompostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 229
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 173, Number 1,075
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast