Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Sarnowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1658AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
24 May 1677AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Dec 1680DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Sarnowski
Bishop Stanisław Sarnowski (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaradien
Ordained BishopAbbey, Sulejow

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 26
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast