Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boemund von Saarbrücken

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1354AppointedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
13 May 1354Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
Mar 1362³ResignedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
10 Feb 1367DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boemund von Saarbrücken
Archbishop Boemund von Saarbrücken (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon
Death PlaceSaarburg

  • a bishop for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 6 Jan 2021

Quantcast