Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gutierre Ruiz de Mesa (Téllez)

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1317AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
1 Oct 1322AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
11 Apr 1326AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
28 Feb 1336DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gutierre Ruiz de Mesa (Téllez)
Bishop Gutierre Ruiz de Mesa (Téllez) (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 209, and Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast