Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerard de Rougemont

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1220AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
26 Mar 1221AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
28 Mar 1221Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
Mar 1225³DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerard de Rougemont
Archbishop Gerard de Rougemont (died Mar 1225) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 137, and Page 296
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast