Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sister Carmen Ros Nortes, N.S.C.

Under Secretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Member of Hermanas de Nuestra Señora de la Consolación


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1953 Born
19 Jan 198632.0Perpetual VowsMember of Hermanas de Nuestra Señora de la Consolación
23 Feb 201864.1AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Carmen Ros Nortes
Sister Carmen Ros Nortes N.S.C. (born ) Under Secretary of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspinardo in Murcia, Spain

Please contact the Sister through the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life.

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Mar 2021

Quantcast