Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejo Fernando de Rojas y Acevedo

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688¹Born
10 Jan 171830.0AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
28 Feb 171931.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
28 Dec 172032.9InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
30 Aug 172335.6AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1730¹42.0DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alejo Fernando de Rojas y Acevedo (VIAF: 311471054)
Bishop Alejo Fernando de Rojas y Acevedo (born 1688, died 1730) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Ordained PriestLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224, and Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast